UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND, GRAND SECRETARY'S DISCRETIONARY FUND

Charity number: 210165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Grand Secretary's Discretionary Fund provides minor and emergency grants and donations, not necessarily to those with a direct Masonic connection. Grants and donations are made at the discretion of the Grand Secretary for such charitable purposes as he might consider proper.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £31,738
Total expenditure: £75,922

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 27 October 2021: Funds received from 516727 THE HAWKSHEAD LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 28 February 2022: Funds received from 210166 UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND LETCHWORTH MEMORIAL ...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE GRAND SECRETARY'S DISCRETIONARY FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adrian Ross Thomas Marsh Trustee 07 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £114.67k £431.28k £40.71k £89.17k £31.74k
Total expenditure £77.72k £38.53k £10.28k £33.63k £75.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
60 Great Queen Street
Holborn
London
WC2B 5AZ
Phone:
02079359259
Website:

No information available