LLOYD'S PATRIOTIC FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lloyd's Patriotic Fund supports serving and ex-service members of the British Armed Forces and their families, with a particular focus on those who are disabled or facing poverty, illness and hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Butler | Chair | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Warren | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola West | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Warren Clegg | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Keville | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean McGovern | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James de Labilliere | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Maxwell | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Welham | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Air Commodore Wendy Rothery | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £381.97k | £441.00k | £470.00k | £579.00k | £464.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.70k | £348.00k | £185.00k | £400.00k | £214.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £401.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £178.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £378.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28TH MAY 1875. HIGH COURT SCHEME OF 10TH MARCH 1958. SCHEMES OF 6/2/63 ,24/1/68, 17/10/79 AND 28/6/04
Charitable objects
PECUNIARY AID OR ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES OR THEIR WIDOWS, ORPHANS, OR DEPENDENT RELATIVES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE ARE FITTING OBJECTS FOR SUCH AID, HAVING SPECIAL REGARD TO SUFFERINGS AND LOSSES ARISING DURING SERVICES IN ACTION. THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN OF SUCH SERVICEMEN.(SEE CLAUSES 17 - 21 OF SCHEME OF 28TH MAY 1875).SURPLUS INCOME MAY BE APPLIED IN MAKING GRANTS TO ANY OF THE INSTITUTIONS REFERRED TO IN SCHEME OF 1875 OR INSTITUTIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 05 March 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
LLOYD'S
ONE LIME STREET
LONDON
EC3M 7HA
- Phone:
- 02073275484
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window