LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN ELIZABETH THE QUEEN MOTHER HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the League is to relieve patients of the Hospital who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm and, generally to support the charitable work of the above Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE RAMSGATE AND MARGATE GENERAL HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYLVIA PHEILS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Thomas Miller | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Bastow | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Leach | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Sandy | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Walsh | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Scarlett | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERRY LEIGH CUNARD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Whitehead | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Scott | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda JUDD | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.44k | £102.73k | £64.60k | £105.99k | £181.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.74k | £132.61k | £90.90k | £112.38k | £130.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 1957 AS AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 1998. AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF OF THE QUEEN ELIZABETH THE QUEEN MOTHER HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
THANET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OFFICE
QUEEN ELIZABETH
THE QUEEN MOTHER HOSPITAL
ST PETERS ROAD
MARGATE KENT
CT9 4AN
- Phone:
- 01843234507
- Email:
- qeqmfriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window