THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ICE is a international membership organisation that exists to promote and advance civil engineering around the world. Civil Engineers design, build and maintain roads, railways, airports, ports, power stations, flood defences, water and waste systems. Where possible they seek to minimise society's impact on the environment and look for more sustainable ways of meeting our needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£42,712,000
Donations and legacies | £584.00k | |
Charitable activities | £18.53m | |
Other trading activities | £22.10m | |
Investments | £973.00k | |
Other | £523.00k |
Total expenditure:
£41,067,000
Raising funds | £14.72m | |
Charitable activities | £26.35m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,045,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.72m | |
Charitable expenditure | £26.35m | |
Retained for future use | £1.65m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.72m | |
Charitable expenditure | £26.35m | |
Retained for future use | £2.69m |
People

348 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
10000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 24 |
£70k to £80k | 18 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 6 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 3 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
£200k to £250k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Hong Kong
- Malaysia
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 04 March 1963: Standard registration
- ICE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ohis Ilalokhoin | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Rew | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Barlow | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priti Parikh | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Norman Porter | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Louise Wood | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Philip Bingham | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Alan Spruce | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Bayfield | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula McMahon | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James William Hall | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liz Helen Waugh | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.20m | £33.07m | £35.04m | £40.40m | £42.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.58m | £30.68m | £29.80m | £37.39m | £41.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £546.43k | £1.25m | £1.08m | £548.34k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £502.55k | £220.82k | £18.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £787.00k | £1.43m | £974.00k | £1.84m | £584.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £18.46m | £13.23m | £15.55m | £20.36m | £22.10m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.42m | £17.89m | £18.16m | £17.53m | £18.53m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £401.00k | £253.00k | £240.00k | £449.00k | £973.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £137.00k | £264.00k | £117.00k | £229.00k | £523.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £38.00k | £43.00k | £66.00k | £1.25m | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.63m | £19.67m | £18.72m | £23.27m | £26.35m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £13.95m | £11.01m | £11.08m | £14.11m | £14.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £248.00k | £140.00k | £41.00k | £52.00k | £80.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £58.00k | £110.00k | £69.00k | £118.00k | £167.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £134.00k | £110.00k | £116.00k | £114.00k | £134.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £44.40m | £43.97m | £45.32m | £44.18m | £44.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | £21.05m | £21.94m | £23.81m | £20.75m | £31.72m | |
|
Other assets | £10.38m | £12.62m | £16.85m | £18.52m | £15.60m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £5.99m | £8.49m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.86m | £11.68m | £12.50m | £12.35m | £12.47m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 3 JUNE 1828 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS 3 AUGUST 1887, 20 MARCH 1895, 24 FEBRUARY 1922, 9 AUGUST 1962 REVOKED BY ROYAL CHARTER 11 JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 1981, 27 OCTOBER 1982, 8 FEBRUARY 2000, AND 18 JUNE 2001. AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CIVIL ENGINEERING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ALFRED YARROW EDUCATIONAL FUND
- BAKER MEDAL FUND
- C C LINDSAY CIVIL ENGINEERING SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
- C H ROBERTS BEQUEST
- CHARLES HAWKSLEY BEQUEST
- CIVIL ENGINEERS' AWARDS FUND
- COOPERS HILL WAR MEMORIAL
- CRAMPTON BEQUEST
- CULMANN FUND
- FREDERICK PALMER PRIZE
- G H DENNISON FUND
- HALCROW BEQUEST
- HOWARD BEQUEST
- INDIAN FUND
- J D AND E D KNIGHT FUND
- JAMES ALFRED EWING MEDAL FUND
- JAMES FORREST LECTURE FUND
- JOHN BAYLISS BEQUEST
- KELVIN MEDAL FUND
- MANBY PREMIUM FUND
- MILLER FUND
- PALMER SCHOLARSHIP
- RADLEY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- ROBERT ALFRED CARR BEQUEST
- RUSSELL ALLIN PRIZE
- SIR HORACE BOOT FUND
- TELFORD FUND
- TREVITHICK MEMORIAL
- UNWIN LIBRARY ENDOWMENT
- VERNON-HARCOURT BEQUEST
- WEBB BEQUEST
- WILLIAM CAWTHORNE UNWIN LECTURESHIP
- WILLIAM LINDLEY FUND
- 04 March 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS
1 GREAT GEORGE STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3AA
- Phone:
- 020 7222 7722
- Email:
- enquiries@ice.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window