DORIS BOUGHTON FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to current and past employees, including their dependants, of Whitnash PLC (formerly Automotive Products PLC) together with the continuing businesses which were UK subsidiaries of Automotive Products Group Ltd at any time up until 31 December 2006, who are, in the opinion of the Management Committee, in need of such assistance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 24 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bahadar Singh Nagra | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Shurvinton | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Williams | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Bowden | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLLR BRIAN SMART | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SPARKES | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.83k | £37.30k | £44.97k | £52.11k | £58.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.27k | £57.03k | £67.29k | £57.51k | £49.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/09/1949 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/04/2015 as amended on 21 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN IN THE EMPLOY OF THE AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS COMPANY LIMITED, BORG AND BECK COMPANY LIMITED,LOCKHEED HYDRAULIC BRAKE COMPANY LIMITED, AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATED LIMITED OR AVERY EQUIPMENT LIMITED AND ANY RELATIVE OR DEPENDANT IN NEED BEING NECESSITOUS AND IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Admington Drive
Hatton Park
WARWICK
CV35 7TZ
- Phone:
- 07866554290
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window