EAST TUDDENHAM CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charities aim is to keep the almshouses in good condition at a fair maintenance payment for needy people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN CRAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Graham Anderson | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Mugford | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Robinson | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE MARCHANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY RATCLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.85k | £25.07k | £24.62k | £25.67k | £32.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.79k | £27.28k | £28.03k | £15.00k | £18.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 FEBRUARY 1968
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EAST TUDDENHAM.
Linked charities
- DONOR UNKNOWN (RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES)
- FREDERICK TILNEY (ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES)
- FUEL CHARITY
- GLADSTONE'S BREAD CHARITY (ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES)
- JOHN PROO (ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES)
- REVEREND JEREMIAH REVANS (REVANS CHARITIES)
- REVEREND JEREMIAH REVANS AND MARY HIS WIFE (REVANS CHARITIES)
- STEPHEN GOOCH (RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES)
- THOMAS ROGER DU QUESNE (RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES)
- WILLIAM MOWTING (RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES)
- 22 March 1968 : Standard registration
- 23 March 2020 : Removed
- 23 March 2020 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHVIEW
COLLENS GREEN
LYNG
NORWICH
NR9 5LH
- Phone:
- 01362 691728
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window