Governing document HUGGENS'S COLLEGE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE INDENTURE OF SALE DATED 25 JULY 1844 AS SUPPLEMENTED BY THE ACT OF PARLIAMENT DATED 22 JULY 1847 AND COMMISSION SCHEMES DATED 17 FEBRUARY 1872, 26 OCTOBER 1906, 21 MAY 1946, 6 MAY 1949 AND 21 JUNE 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING IN THE FORM OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR OLDER PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (THE BENEFICIARIES); AND (B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CURRENT RESIDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.