Accounts and annual returns BLAKENEY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 210371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2007 07 April 2008 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2006 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2004 25 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2004 Not Required