Financial history AGE CONCERN WARE

Charity number: 210380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.70k £9.79k £16.79k £44.82k £49.83k
Total expenditure £17.43k £8.97k £15.22k £71.55k £60.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £500 £375 N/A