LEISTON AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist people with disabilities and other medical needs that cannot be met by the NHS. Make grants to provide medical equipment to the community, for example via the local surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 November 1962: Standard registration
- ALDRINGHAM & DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR NICOLA MARY MAGGS | Chair | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Wright | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE COSGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR SUSAN MARGARET GEATER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £495 | £380 | £379 | £387 | £390 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2022 | 498 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 3 SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS WHO ARE SICK,DISABLED,HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crown Lodge
Sizewell
LEISTON
IP16 4TP
- Phone:
- 01728831718
- Email:
- LDNAT@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window