WORCESTERSHIRE MASONIC CHARITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 210408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising of funds by donation, running sheltered accommodation and making grants/donations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £102,128
Total expenditure: £283,686

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • WORCESTERSHIRE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN WYER Chair 16 July 2013
None on record
Rev Justin Trevelyan Parker Trustee 01 June 2023
EWE AND YOU
Received: On time
THE P A R CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WORCESTERSHIRE MASONIC LIBRARY AND MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Wong Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Keith Evans Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
MICHAEL DYKES Trustee 05 June 2019
THE WORCESTERSHIRE MASONIC LIBRARY AND MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £129.40k £82.66k £86.60k £109.39k £102.13k
Total expenditure £133.63k £74.57k £69.49k £117.99k £283.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 February 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 February 2024 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PGL OFFICES
94 BIRMINGHAM ROAD
BROMSGROVE
WORCESTERSHIRE
B61 0DF
Phone:
01527879300
Website:

No information available