LEANORA MESSEL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 210422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall providing a facility for activities as set out under the Classification Sections.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,773
Total expenditure: £10,982

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DANEHILL MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Burwood Chair 16 April 2018
None on record
Ian Barras-Hill Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
John Leslie Older Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
Andrew John Hicks Trustee 14 October 2019
THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS DANEHILL AND CHELWOOD GATE CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
Rosemary Burwood Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
Peter Norton Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
Sarah Jennifer Elizabeth Norton Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.00k £14.58k £15.97k £9.45k £8.77k
Total expenditure £14.46k £8.55k £13.64k £11.17k £10.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Russets
Church Lane
Danehill
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 7EU
Phone:
01825 000000
Website:

danehillhall.co.uk