ROCHFORD CHARITIES

Charity Number: 210524
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide accomodation for six single elderly persons in six historic 16th century one bedroom cottages, who have lived or worked in the Rochford district.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £42,712
Total expenditure: £28,167

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 August 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROCHFORD CHARITIES (Working name)
  • LORD RYCHE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Howard Chair
ROCHFORD CHARITIES
Recently registered
4TH ROCHFORD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
JOHN PHILIP SMOOTHY Trustee 06 June 2018
THE PRIORY CHAPTER NO 1000 BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Jo McPherson Trustee 29 March 2017
None on record
JOHN JACKSON Trustee 08 September 2013
ROCHFORD CHARITIES
Recently registered
Christopher Clark Trustee 14 November 2011
ROCHFORD CHARITIES
Recently registered
JUBILEE MASTER'S LODGE NO 2712 BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE JUBILEE MASTERS LODGE CENTENARY TRUST
Received: On time
Robert Whittingham Trustee
ROCHFORD CHARITIES
Recently registered
DAVID COTTIS Trustee
ROCHFORD CHARITIES
Recently registered
Felicity Squier Trustee
ROCHFORD CHARITIES
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £72.77k £77.17k £41.08k £52.72k £42.71k
Total expenditure £29.17k £11.14k £18.41k £28.28k £28.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.00k £1.18k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
111 Alexandra Road
Great Wakering
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS3 0GX
Phone:
07452883290
Website:

No information available