Accounts and annual returns KINGSTON SOCIETY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES

Charity number: 210583
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 12 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 14 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 30 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required