KINGSTON SOCIETY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kingston Mencap is a voluntary self help group with a membership including children and adults with learning disabilities, their families and carers. We provide information and support; campaign for equal rights and opportunities; organise social and leisure events; run 3 evening leisure clubs for members; run a carers support group and Saturday Drop-In
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 07 November 1962: Standard registration
- 02 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KINGSTON MENCAP (Working name)
- KINGSTON SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.08k | £15.80k | £12.67k | £29.55k | £80.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.64k | £33.89k | £37.28k | £28.06k | £35.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.73k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 21 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 21 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 07 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 12 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 14 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MARCH 1964 AS AMENDED 2ND FEBRUARY 1982 AND 11TH FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE KINGSTON AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window