THE MARGARET DE SOUSA-DEIRO FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Margaret de Sousa Deiro Fund is a UK charity which awards grants to women in financial need living in the UK and suffering from any illness with the priority on respiratory conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- MARGARET'S (Working name)
- MARGARET'S FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carina Georgiades | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Peters | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Moira Christine Dick | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Dronfield | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.95k | £97.09k | £84.04k | £84.47k | £98.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.46k | £100.30k | £110.63k | £122.91k | £131.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(1) THE TREATMENT, CARE, REHABILITATION AND AFTER CARE OF INDIGENT PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM PULMONARY TUBERCULOSIS OR FROM ANY OTHER DISEASE OF THE CHEST. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARD THE OBJECT SPECIFIED ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF INDIGENT WOMEN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY DISEASE. (3) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MARGARET DE SOUSA-DEIRO FUND
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 07731459680
- Email:
- info@margaretsfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window