ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BROMLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rehome unwanted pets, neuter & microchip pets assist with animal welfare problems. Provides help with vet bills for owners on low income/benefits. Supports the RSPCA Inspectorate (& animals signed over to them & the main RSPCA). Covers postcodes BR1, BR2, BR3, BR4, BR5, BR6, BR7 & TN16 (3). Run by volunteers in their available spare time. Receives no funding & strictly dependent upon donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
Governance
- 01 November 1965: Standard registration
- RSPCA BROMLEY (Working name)
- RSPCA BROMLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA BROMLEY BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA - KENT - BROMLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA -BROMLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hemmings | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Leonova | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Chalk | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haidee Rose Ryan | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GLEN ROBSON | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosalie Andrew | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS J BATTERBEE | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Sylvia Goodger | Trustee | 15 June 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.29k | £30.37k | £26.24k | £45.34k | £82.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.44k | £23.71k | £6.22k | £39.84k | £67.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BROMLEY AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 723
Bromley
BR2 9WR
- Phone:
- 07538472822
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window