Accounts and annual returns WOODTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 210668
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 August 2024 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 November 2023 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required