OXFORD AND BERMONDSEY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Development Sport & Recreation Training Residentials
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £37,426 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 04 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA MARIE SMIKLE | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KAYODE SITU | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER THURGOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.37k | £88.62k | £105.33k | £602.44k | £115.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.87k | £100.93k | £111.90k | £128.85k | £141.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.39k | £75.54k | £57.68k | £34.24k | £37.43k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £529.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £72.96k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £415 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £128.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE. UNDER ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 19TH APRIL 1937. NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAR 1950 as amended on 14 Mar 2023 as amended on 14 Mar 2023 as amended on 14 Mar 2023 as amended on 14 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
2.1 The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit: 2.1.1 to carry on charitable work by means of providing facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents in South-East London; and 2.1.2 to carry on in Great Britain and Northern Ireland any other exclusively charitable purposes of a religious, philanthropic or social character as the Trustees decide in their absolute discretion from time to time.
Area of benefit
1)SOUTH EAST LONDON 2)NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OXFORD & BERMONDSEY CLUB
3 WEBB STREET
LONDON
SE1 4RP
- Phone:
- 02072319249
- Email:
- nick.riley@theobc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window