THE TOWN LANDS

Charity number: 210714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of investment income for the benefit of individuals and organisations who live/operate within the town boundary of Beccles, and seek assistance from the Trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £149,818
Total expenditure: £171,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 29 January 2016: Funds received from 249015 THE REVEREND THOMAS FARR'S CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BECCLES FEOFFEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Anthony Hickman Trustee 02 December 2020
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
JAMES BRYAN COOK Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
FAY LOUVAINE BALDRY Trustee 06 December 2017
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
MARK JERMEY Trustee 06 December 2017
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Dr TIMOTHY JOHN MORTON Trustee 06 December 2017
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
ROBERT JAMES SEPPINGS Trustee 31 July 2012
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
KEITH GREGORY Trustee
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
JAMES MICHAEL HARTLEY Trustee
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
KENNETH JOHN LEGGETT Trustee
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
JENNIFER IRENE LANGESKOV Trustee
PURVIS ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £148.49k £165.34k £152.99k £154.28k £149.82k
Total expenditure £213.91k £242.27k £153.05k £189.91k £171.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 18 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 02 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 02 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 13 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 13 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 11 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 11 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Beccles Townlands Charity
Leman House
Ballygate
BECCLES
NR34 9ND
Phone:
07584 322845
Email:
No information available