IFFLEY BURIAL GROUND FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burials of deceased people and interment of ashes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DOUGALL MORRISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ruth Mary Dixon | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Clare Julia Yates Hayns | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Laube | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.93k | £4.92k | £25.04k | £5.76k | £4.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.77k | £3.11k | £12.38k | £3.33k | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TWO INDENTURES BOTH DATED 7TH JULY 1908
Charitable objects
LAND TO BE HELD AS A BURIAL GROUND FOR RESIDENTS IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF 2IFFLEY.
Area of benefit
IFFLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
MILL LANE
IFFLEY
OXFORD
OX4 4EJ
- Phone:
- 01865773516
- Email:
- vicar@iffleychurch.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window