THE ROYAL UNITED KINGDOM BENEFICENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to enable older people to lead independent and fulfilling lives. We do this by providing high quality advice & information services, befriending & support services and campaigning work on behalf of older people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,609,000
Donations and legacies | £2.16m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £135.00k | |
Investments | £5.31m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£12,570,000
Raising funds | £1.71m | |
Charitable activities | £10.86m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,626,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £37,550 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.71m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.86m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.71m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.86m | |
Retained for future use | £2.67m |
People

128 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
895 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 October 1963: Standard registration
- 10 May 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- INDEPENDENT AGE (Working name)
- INDEPENDENTAGE (Working name)
- RUKBA (Working name)
- THE ROYAL UNITED KINGDOM BENEFICENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helena Rebecca Herklots | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Greenspan | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Shelley | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Elliott | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Guillermo Pablo Donadini | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Caroline Glendinning | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Anderson | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Karen Elizabeth Byrne | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Amitkumar Nitin Patel | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.10m | £8.69m | £7.35m | £7.79m | £7.61m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.51m | £16.56m | £12.47m | £13.39m | £12.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £83.61k | N/A | £37.55k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.38m | £4.11m | £3.49m | £3.91m | £2.16m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £199.00k | £179.00k | £109.00k | £164.00k | £135.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.49m | £4.32m | £3.74m | £3.70m | £5.31m | |
|
Income - Other | £33.00k | £69.00k | £10.00k | £20.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £909.00k | £865.00k | £1.47m | £702.00k | £553.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.89m | £14.23m | £10.53m | £11.23m | £10.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.62m | £2.33m | £1.94m | £2.15m | £1.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £119.00k | £79.00k | £88.00k | £193.00k | £129.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £2.38m | £1.08m | £2.08m | £1.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £222.00k | £274.00k | £284.00k | £404.00k | £316.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.20m | £2.04m | £1.97m | £1.87m | £1.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £174.84m | £167.37m | £176.08m | £161.82m | £161.81m | |
|
Other assets | £5.31m | £3.32m | £5.87m | £6.14m | £7.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £282.00k | £114.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.20m | £6.68m | £6.44m | £6.03m | £4.86m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 18/02/1911 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 01/08/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE PRIMARILY TO ASSIST AND PROVIDE RELIEF TO OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO ASSIST AND PROVIDE RELIEF TO OTHERS IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, SOCIAL OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Area of benefit
THE BRITISH ISLES
Linked charities
- ALL SAINTS HOME
- CHARITY CALLED ALL SAINTS HOME
- FILSTONE FUND
- GEORGINA TOMPKINS LADIES HOME
- RUKBA HOLIDAYS FUND
- THE ALLEN CHARITY FUND
- THE BACKSETTOWN CHARITY
- THE BACKSETTOWN ENDOWED CHARITY
- THE EALING LADIES HOME PENSION FUND
- THE ELIZA SWAFFIELD ANNUITIES FUND
- THE ELIZA SWAFFIELD ANNUITIES FUND
- THE F E COBBOLD TRUST FUND
- THE GEORGE BALLARD PENSION CHARITY
- THE H F BAILEY ANNUITIES FUND
- THE JAMES PORTER RUKBA CHARITY
- THE JAMES WITHAM THOMPSON TRUST FUND
- THE JAMES WITHAM THOMPSON TRUST FUND
- THE JOHN WALTON FUND
- THE NINA MACNAIR FUND
- THE NINA MACNAIR FUND
- THOMAS HAWE
- 11 October 1963 : Standard registration
- 10 May 2022 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Avonmore Road
LONDON
W14 8RR
- Phone:
- 02076054206
- Email:
- charity@independentage.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window