Trustees EDWARD SHOULDHAM'S CHARITY
Charity number: 210811

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN GOLDING | Chair |
|
||||||
Andrew Prior | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Martin James Zipfell | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Samuel Small | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Roy Bailey | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Colin Rockcliffe | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JOYCE LEEDELL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.