THE PARKER AND ASHCOMBE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Social Housing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 30 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham PETERS | Chair |
|
||||||
JOHN BARNETT | Trustee | 12 November 2011 |
|
|||||
ELLIE POTTINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.68k | £27.25k | £17.32k | £14.79k | £22.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.62k | £29.28k | £26.05k | £31.25k | £31.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 February 2021 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21 JANUARY 1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH A PREFERENCE FOR A) SINGLE WOMEN AND WIDOWS AND B) THOSE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BODIAM.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BODIAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 HEATHLANDS
WESTFIELD
HASTINGS
TN35 4QZ
- Phone:
- 01424753323
- Email:
- johnbarnett9@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window