THE NAVY RECORDS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publishes volumes of naval history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Martin Howard Wilcox | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Hellawell | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Harding | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Beck | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Virginia Preston | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ERICA CHARTERS | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Lambert | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Blake | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Black | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.83k | £38.61k | £42.83k | £39.53k | £43.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.96k | £35.46k | £36.87k | £37.04k | £40.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 4TH JULY 1893, AND AMENDE 4TH JULY 1984 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 NOV 2019 as amended on 05 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO FOSTER AND FACILITATE AN UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY, ORGANISATION AND SOCIAL LIFE OF THE NAVY BY: ·SELECTING, EDITING AND PUBLISHING DOCUMENTS (INCLUDING IMAGES, FILM ETC) THAT ARE RELEVANT TO THESE THEMES AND APPROPRIATE TO SCHOLARS, SERVING PERSONNEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ·REPRODUCING RARE OR GENERALLY INACCESSIBLE WORKS OF NAVAL INTEREST, AND ·REPRODUCING TRANSLATIONS OF SIMILAR MANUSCRIPTS OR WORKS IN FOREIGN LANGUAGES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Back Lane
Tingewick
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 4RL
- Phone:
- 01280847310
- Email:
- honsec@navyrecords.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window