MRS MAUD VAN NORDEN'S CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees operate a grant giving policy,providing funds for such charitable objects or institution as they think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 October 1962: Standard registration
- VAN NORDEN CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Lindsay Merriman | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Flavelle Merriman QC | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JOHN WINGERATH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.30k | £42.42k | £47.55k | £63.22k | £26.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.12k | £60.37k | £59.50k | £62.53k | £651 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 11TH AUGUST 1960
Charitable objects
TO APPLY INCOME OR CAPITAL FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN SUPPORT OF SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE WORKS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BM BOX 2367
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 02074654300
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window