Financial history THE LUCY BRANGWYN HOMES

Charity number: 210846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.38k £8.22k £7.99k £8.56k £8.50k
Total expenditure £1.87k £2.07k £1.86k £4.91k £14.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A