JOHN FRANKLYN'S ALMSHOUSES (INCLUDING SUBSIDIARY CHARITY OF MARY ROSAMOND WALTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide six almshouse cottages in East Farleigh for the poor of the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- THE SIR JOHN FRANKLYN'S CHARITY FOR ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD YAXLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Richardson | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Smith | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jennings | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.49k | £31.11k | £27.57k | £15.00k | £28.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.57k | £19.97k | £21.04k | £13.87k | £13.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 JUNE 1937 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 8 SEPTEMBER 1965.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF EAST FARLEIGH FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS NEXT PROCEEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF EAST FARLEIGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glen Clova
Workhouse Lane
East Farleigh
Maidstone
ME15 0QB
- Phone:
- 01622745894
- Email:
- glenclovaha@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window