GREGORY SMITH'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity Trustees' role is to distribute monies received from land, allotments (occupied by tenants) and investments for the parish of Hindringham,which are collected by the Hon. Secretary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 October 1962: Standard registration
- HINDRINGHAM BREAD & FUEL CHARITY (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL JEAN FLOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN DYE | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARION OLIVER | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS WILLIAM HAWES | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ARTHUR ROGER FLOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £3.48k | £3.56k | £3.54k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £1.56k | £2.31k | £1.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 February 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2024 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P.R. 29(I) PAGE 664
Charitable objects
BREAD FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
HINDRINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HENERY HOUSE
HARVEST LANE
HINDRINGHAM
FAKENHAM
NR21 0PW
- Phone:
- 01328878249
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window