THE GRAY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants for charitable purposes, primarily for the benefit of the elderly, and for charitable purposes in the parishes of Linby and Papplewick and the surrounding area, and to provide sheltered accommodation for the elderly in Sherwood House and cottages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 October 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 01 November 1962: Standard registration
- 03 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1190568 THE GRAY TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/10/2022 | 05/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.62k | £116.24k | £116.34k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.58k | £229.87k | £278.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 October 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH AUGUST 1962 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF ANY SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window