Governing document SOUTH EASTERN ELECTRICITY INDUSTRIAL STAFF BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity Number: 210994
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF SOCIETY DATED MAY 1957 AND AMENDED 18TH MARCH 1959, 11TH MARCH 1960, 30TH NOVEMBER 1960, 24TH MARCH 1961 AND 27TH APRIL 1977
Charitable objects
GRANTING RELIEF IN CASE OF NECESSITY IN MONEY OR KIND:- 1. TO OR FOR PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND IN RESPECT OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY, 2. PERSONS WHO ALTHOUGH NOT MEMBERS OR PAST MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY ARE OR WERE ELIGIBLE FOR MEMBERSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
KENT,SUSSEX,SURREY AND PART OF GREATER LONDON AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.