Financial history MOUNT ST BERNARD ABBEY TRUSTEES REGISTERED

Charity number: 211004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £858.15k £650.52k £929.20k £1.12m £1.19m
Total expenditure £931.66k £766.72k £998.08k £1.24m £1.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.96k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £179.41k £121.90k £177.11k £327.93k £445.79k
Income - Other trading activities £5.87k £13.79k £19.36k £19.26k £0
Income - Charitable activities £512.50k £370.20k £583.54k £584.92k £546.70k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £139.59k £141.43k £147.56k £178.81k £191.34k
Income - Other £20.79k £3.20k £1.64k £7.75k £5.51k
Income - Legacies £35.41k £7.62k £91.80k £206.43k £302.71k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £880.32k £713.52k £926.81k £1.17m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £51.34k £53.20k £71.27k £61.72k £100.76k
Expenditure - Governance £9.16k £9.54k £9.80k £13.60k £14.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.24k £11.77k £37.57k £18.30k £14.32k
Expenditure - Investment management £42.10k £7.69k £49.82k £57.35k £20.70k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0