STROKE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY OPERATES THROUGHOUT THE UK. WE PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES TO EVERYONE AFFECTED BY STROKE, INCLUDING FAMILIES AND CARERS. WE RAISE AWARENESS OF STROKE AND CAMPAIGN FOR BETTER EMERGENCY, REHABILITATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES. WE INVEST IN STROKE RESEARCH TO HELP REDUCE THE INCIDENCE OF STROKE, TO FIND THE BEST TREATMENT AND LONG TERM CARE AND IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR STROKE SURVIVORS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£42,144,680
Donations and legacies | £28.86m | |
Charitable activities | £11.59m | |
Other trading activities | £81.23k | |
Investments | £735.02k | |
Other | £887.18k |
Total expenditure:
£43,826,107
Raising funds | £8.58m | |
Charitable activities | £35.25m | |
Other | £0 |
£3,624,891 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £10,052,270 from 85 government contract(s) and £1,071,730 from 14 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.58m | |
Charitable expenditure | £35.25m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.58m | |
Charitable expenditure | £35.25m | |
Retained for future use | £1.94m |
People

795 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1425 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 16 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 June 1989: Standard registration
- THE STROKE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN KING | Chair | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Niamh Kennedy | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rustam Al-Shahi Salman | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Claire Catchpool | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Archibald | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Spentzos | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Jackson | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Avril Drummond | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Macpherson Lee | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eduardo Garcez | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Gillespie | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Buckle | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr MARTIN ANTHONY JAMES | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.62m | £34.57m | £41.16m | £40.42m | £42.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.49m | £34.13m | £31.60m | £38.10m | £43.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.96m | £2.95m | £1.99m | £1.55m | £10.05m | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.61k | £2.42m | £20.23k | £685.77k | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.28m | £22.30m | £30.16m | £28.23m | £28.86m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £103.00k | £123.00k | £121.00k | £0 | £81.23k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.21m | £10.27m | £10.11m | £10.81m | £11.59m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £554.00k | £533.00k | £451.00k | £611.00k | £735.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £481.00k | £1.35m | £314.00k | £765.00k | £887.18k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £12.67m | £12.06m | £19.30m | £16.79k | £16.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £30.33m | £26.48m | £24.67m | £30.07m | £35.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.17m | £7.64m | £6.93m | £8.03m | £8.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £704.00k | £608.00k | £764.00k | £691.00k | £733.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £631.00k | £1.28m | £1.25m | £2.02m | £3.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £151.00k | £112.03k | £126.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.95m | £21.29m | £3.23m | £2.92m | £1.31m | |
|
Long-term investments | £19.48m | £2.66m | £25.10m | £27.47m | £28.89m | |
|
Other assets | £6.83m | £9.67m | £15.66m | £15.36m | £18.43m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.51m | £12.21m | £10.88m | £10.80m | £11.74m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/1899 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/05/2012 as amended on 24 Sep 2018 as amended on 18 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
(A) WORKING FOR THE PREVENTION OF STROKE; (B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS CONCERNING STROKE; (C) CARRYING OUT, PROMOTING OR SPONSORING RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF STROKE OR OTHER CONDITIONS WHERE THE EFFECTS ARE SIMILAR TO STROKE, THE REHABILITATION AND LONG-TERM CARE OF STROKE SURVIVORS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (D) RESPONDING TO THE NEEDS CAUSED BY THE EFFECTS OF STROKE, OR OTHER CONDITIONS WHERE THE EFFECTS ARE SIMILAR TO STROKE, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE AFFECTED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 01 June 1989 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stroke Association
Stroke Association House
240 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2PR
- Phone:
- 02075660300
- Email:
- info@stroke.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window