Frederick Andrew Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To award grants to women for convalescence, home help or Health Care Professions Council registered therapies following illness or injury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 1962: Standard registration
- 14 July 2016: Funds received from 266816 THE MRS BEN JONES GUILD CONVALESCENT FUND
- THE FREDERICK ANDREW CONVALESCENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS R LAMB | Chair | 30 November 2001 |
|
|
||||
Crispin Vitoria | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacki Grace Spencer | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Strawson | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|||||
WENDY GELDER | Trustee | 08 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
PETER DENBY | Trustee | 25 May 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.14k | £65.85k | £67.99k | £74.25k | £78.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.17k | £48.36k | £58.22k | £93.62k | £93.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 29TH JUNE 1970 AND 2ND JANUARY 1976 as amended on 22 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
ASSISTING THE RESTORATION TO HEALTH OF SUCH BENEFICIARIES BY THE CHARITY AS THE GOVERNORS MAY SELECT EITHER BY MAKING GRANTS TO DEFRAY THE EXPENCE OF RECUPERATIVE HOLIDAYS OR OTHER CONVALESCENT TREATMENT OR BY MAKING DONATIONS OR PAYING SUBSCRIPTIONS IN AID OF THE FUNDS OF ANY CONVALESCENT HOME OR OTHER INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION AT OR FROM WHICH THE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY MAY RECEIVE CARE AND RELIEF. ANY INCOME NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN THE ABOVE MANNER MAY BE APPLIED FOR RETIRED WOMEN WHO ARE IN NEED OF CONVALESCENCE AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHO WERE OTHERWISE FORMERLY QUALIFIED AS BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 1291
LINCOLN
LN5 5RA
- Phone:
- 07534184684
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window