Linked charities ORSETT PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 211034
Up to date
Linked charities
- AMBROSE GILBERT
- CHARITY OF JANE BAKER FOR CLEANING MONUMENTS(CHURCH BRANCH)
- DAME JANE TRAFFORD SOUTHWELL
- JANE BAKER FOR COALS
- JASPAR KINSMAN
- JESSE NEWCOMBE
- JOHN BLATCH
- JOHN FREEMAN
- RICHARD BAKER
- SARAH BUSH
- SHARE OF ALICE HEMINGE CHARITY(CHURCH BRANCH)
- SHARE OF ALICE HEMINGE CHARITY(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- SHARE OF ANONYMOUS DONOR CHARITY(CHURCH BRANCH)
- SHARE OF ANONYMOUS DONOR CHARITY(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- SHARE OF ANONYMOUS DONOR CHARITY(GENERAL PAROCHIAL BRANCH)
- SHARE OF ELIZABETH DOWSETT CHARITY(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- SHARE OF THOMAS HOTOFTE CHARITY(CHURCH BRANCH)
- SHARE OF THOMAS HOTOFTE CHARITY(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- SHARE OF THOMAS HOTOFTE CHARITY(GENERAL PAROCHIAL BRANCH)
- SO MUCH OF THE CHARITY OF THE REV THOMAS JAMES ROBINSON AS IS APPLICABLE IN THE PARISH OF ORSETT
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 24 JULY 1896,3 JULY 1936,31 MARCH 1965 AND 16 JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ORSETT
Registration history
- 25 September 1962 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.