CHARITY OF SIDNEY PAIGE ADAMS FOR IMPROVEMENT OF BOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ANNUAL INCOME TO BE EXPENDED BY THE MAYOR AND CORPORATION OF THE BOROUGH OF TOTNES UPON SUCH OBJECTS AND IN SUCH MANNER FOR THE BENEFIT WELL BEING AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SAID BOROUGH OR THE REDUCTION OF THE RATES OF THE SAID BOROUGH AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE SAID MAYOR AND A TWO THIRDS MAJORITY OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SAID CORPORATION PRESENT AT MEETINGS SPECIALLY CONVENED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Devon
Governance
- 12 August 1963: Standard registration
- ADAMS BEQUEST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Totnes Town Council | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.07k | £17.05k | £37.84k | £28.64k | £35.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.58k | £13.05k | £37.95k | £55.70k | £150.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £13.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
U.V. 238 P237; WILL PROVED 29TH JANUARY 1927.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT, WELL-BEING AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BOROUGH OF TOTNES OR REDUCTION OF RATES OF THE SAID BOROUGH.
Area of benefit
TOTNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Guildhall
Ramparts Walk
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 5QH
- Phone:
- 01803862147
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window