RUTLAND HISTORIC CHURCHES PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 211068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Give grants and loans for the maintenance and improvement of churches in the county of Rutland.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £46,311
Total expenditure: £74,878

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER OUTRAM LAWSON Chair 29 November 2011
None on record
Roger David Wood Trustee 15 June 2023
MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION
Received: On time
RUTLAND AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
PEPPER'S-A SAFE PLACE
Received: On time
Stephen Charles Taylor Trustee 15 June 2023
ST JOHN'S COLLEGE SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Andrew Vyvyan Wainwright Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Martin George Wilson Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
BEVERLEY HANCOCK Trustee 15 June 2022
FRIENDS OF THISTLETON CHURCH
Received: On time
Catherine Alexandra Coulson Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
LAURENCE HOWARD KCVO OBE Trustee 23 March 2022
PETERBOROUGH CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT AND PRESERVATION TRUST CIO
Received: On time
WHISSENDINE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
CHARITY OF HENRY FORSTER
Received: On time
RUTLAND MAGISTRATES FUND
Received: On time
Dr Sarah Furness Trustee 03 June 2020
UPPINGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
OAKHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
RUTLAND GRANTS
Received: On time
PATRICIA MORLEY Trustee 30 November 2016
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF RUTLAND HOSPITALS
Received: On time
RUTLAND HEALTHCARE SUPPORT
Received: On time
SUSAN MARY THOMAS Trustee 08 June 2016
CLIPSHAM YEW TREE AVENUE TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Hitchcox Trustee 03 December 2013
None on record
JOHN CLEMENT SAUNDERS Trustee 07 June 2012
RYHALL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
ESSENDINE VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
MR S HARRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.72k £211.29k £56.42k £12.54k £46.31k
Total expenditure £24.20k £18.58k £53.91k £70.04k £74.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 March 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Old Orchard
Main Street
Thistleton
OAKHAM
Rutland
LE15 7RE
Phone:
07751 398466