TOGETHER FOR MENTAL WELLBEING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TOGETHER IS A LEADING NATIONAL CHARITY WORKING FOR WELLBEING: THAT MEANS WE SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS TO GET WHAT THEY WANT FROM LIFE AND TO FEEL HAPPIER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£22,325,394
Donations and legacies | £98.52k | |
Charitable activities | £21.87m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £236.84k | |
Other | £123.56k |
Total expenditure:
£22,077,180
Raising funds | £40.02k | |
Charitable activities | £22.04m | |
Other | £0 |
£204,310 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £18,191,043 from 44 government contract(s) and £86,042 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £40.02k | |
Charitable expenditure | £22.04m | |
Retained for future use | £248.21k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £40.02k | |
Charitable expenditure | £22.04m | |
Retained for future use | £452.52k |
People

531 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- TOGETHER (Working name)
- MACA (THE MENTAL AFTER CARE ASSOCIATION) (Previous name)
- THE MENTAL AFTER CARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- TOGETHER WORKING FOR WELLBEING (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zain Richardson | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Naheed Hassan | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ajay Mehta | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Betteridge | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Breakwell | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Jones | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Therese Evans | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angus Campbell Cameron | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judy Clements | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Jo'Anne Kerry Cutting | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donald Kay Mungall | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Shakespeare | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr BENJAMIN LAWRANCE THOMAS | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.05m | £19.98m | £18.97m | £20.03m | £22.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.86m | £19.67m | £18.42m | £20.94m | £22.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.21m | £12.08m | £11.05m | £7.18m | £18.19m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £77.58k | £86.04k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £54.91k | £175.26k | £110.39k | £174.59k | £98.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.90m | £19.72m | £18.75m | £19.75m | £21.87m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £86.58k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £67.30k | £64.43k | £57.50k | £100.65k | £236.84k | |
|
Income - Other | £26.46k | £18.03k | £44.77k | £10.65k | £123.56k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £13.30k | £23.34k | £23.81k | £148.33k | £75.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £18.82m | £19.63m | £18.38m | £20.91m | £22.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £39.91k | £41.69k | £32.73k | £31.15k | £40.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £100.12k | £173.59k | £120.54k | £171.91k | £116.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.89k | £2.79k | £2.36k | £923 | £167 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.48m | £11.17m | £11.41m | £11.40m | £11.66m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.79m | £2.18m | £2.27m | £2.19m | £2.45m | |
|
Other assets | £6.43m | £8.36m | £9.62m | £8.96m | £8.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £865.00k | -£82.00k | -£729.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.62m | £3.99m | £4.99m | £5.27m | £5.30m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/01/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/11/2014 as amended on 30 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING, OR AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILL-HEALTH OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH A CONDITION, IN PARTICULAR BY: THE PROMOTION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO PEOPLE IN THE MAINTENANCE AND RECOVERY OF THIS. THE SUPPORT OF CARERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PEOPLE WHO EXPERIENCE MENTAL ILL-HEALTH IN THEIR CARING ROLE AND IN MAINTAINING THEIR OWN MENTAL HEALTH. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL ILL-HEALTH THROUGH THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO USE MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES, CARERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF THOSE WHO EXPERIENCE MENTAL ILL-HEALTH, MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE WIDER PUBLIC. THE PROMOTION OF BEST PRACTICE AND POLICIES IN SUSTAINING MENTAL HEALTH AND ALLEVIATING MENTAL ILL-HEALTH LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND ELSEWHERE. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO MENTAL HEALTH AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Together Working For Wellbeing
52 Walnut Tree Walk
LONDON
SE11 6DN
- Phone:
- 020 7780 7300
- Email:
- contactus@together-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window