THE BEATRICE HANKEY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As 'The Knighthood' to work for the advancement of the Christian religion and relief of poverty in co-operation with Christian churches at home and in the international field. To train and send forth Christian leaders, teachers and missionaries in deprived areas or where the churches need the services of men and women of the Christian vocation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 October 1962: Standard registration
- BLUE PILGRIMS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TATIANA HALLIDAY | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID WILLIAM FAULKS | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Dalgleish | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Eric Sellers | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosalind April Sellers | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Barton | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Walker | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Georgina Ann Vye | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Maunder | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN FAULKS | Trustee | 04 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HILARY Jane WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.09k | £36.63k | £38.51k | £39.68k | £81.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.13k | £43.98k | £44.39k | £67.51k | £58.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATON INCORPORATED 9TH JULY 1949 AS AMENDED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO CONTINUE THE WORK OF BEATRICE AND EVA HANKEY IN CONNECTION WITH THE FELLOWSHIP KNOWN AS "THE KNIGHTHOOD" AND FOR "BLUE PILGRIMS" TO WORK FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AT HOME AND IN THE INTERNATIONAL FIELD. TO TRAIN AND SEND FORTH PERSONS TO ACT AS CHRISTIAN LEADERS, TEACHERS, AND MISSIONARIES IN DEPRIVED AREAS OR WHERE THE CHURCHES NEED THE SERVICES OF MEN AND WOMEN OF THE CHRISTIAN VOCATION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARK J REES & CO
GRANVILLE HALL
11 GRANVILLE ROAD
LEICESTER
LE1 7RU
- Phone:
- 02392350636
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window