ST MARY REDCLIFFE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 211109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to St Mary Redcliffe Church and its parish in relation to the charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 1963: Standard registration
  • 17 April 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 17 April 2018: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARY REDCLIFFE VESTRY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SMRCLC Corporate Trustee Limited Trustee 06 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £837.48k £795.52k £609.57k £909.24k £927.48k
Total expenditure £414.29k £396.71k £258.07k £551.44k £668.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.50k £13.50k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £831.98k £782.02k £609.57k £909.24k £927.48k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £13.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £319.08k £332.79k £191.53k £467.09k £408.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds £95.20k £63.92k £66.54k £84.35k £259.41k
Expenditure - Governance £26.50k £57.30k £50.94k £50.98k £52.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £275.49k £140.59k £416.11k £356.22k
Expenditure - Investment management £52.47k £50.47k £23.56k £26.15k £55.97k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £1.01m £1.50m £1.63m £1.61m
Long-term investments £19.73m £22.78m £23.55m £22.14m £23.48m
Other assets £1.05m £1.24m £1.45m £1.98m £1.02m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.00m £761.44k £606.90k £490.21k £242.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 2ND APRIL 1952
Charitable objects
IN AID OF THE FABRIC FUND OF THE CHURCH AT ST MARY, RADCLIFFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 02 December 1963 : Standard registration
  • 17 April 2018 : Removed
  • 17 April 2018 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
MRS PAT TERRY
ST. MARY REDCLIFFE PARISH OFFICE
12 COLSTON PARADE
BRISTOL
BS1 6RA
Phone:
01172310600
Website:

No information available