ROBERT LABOURNE (SADDLER'S COMPANY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primarily, the provision of financial support to poor Freemen of the Worshipful Company of Saddlers but now effectively to former staff or their dependents with, secondly, the residue of net income for such charitable and pious purposes as the Company thinks fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 1963: Standard registration
- 09 January 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £10.00k | £10.36k | £11.17k | £12.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.44k | £12.22k | £10.66k | £11.26k | £12.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 18 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 29 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 06 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 11 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 09 March 2006 | 37 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 13 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 25 NOVEMBER 1932
Charitable objects
PAYMENT TO/FOR: 1. THE CLERK OF THE COMPANY. 2. THE RENTER WARDEN. 3. THE BEADLE. 4. THE BENEFIT OF ONE OR MORE POOR FREEMEN OF COMPANY AND RESIDUE THEREOF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE AND PIOUS PURPOSES AS COMPANY SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window