Financial history HIGH BAILIFFS LAND

Charity Number: 211190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £875 £3.12k £3.45k £3.11k £2.88k
Total expenditure £1.46k £1.92k £4.07k £3.34k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A