KENT NURSING INSTITUTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supplying equipment to help disabled assisting housebound & sick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 13 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD CANON BRIAN STEVENSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BARRY FISHER | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SPENSLEY | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARY GORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MICHAEL RALPH NEVILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ELIZABETH ENGLISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.51k | £5.62k | £5.87k | £5.95k | £6.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £1.70k | £4.02k | £5.04k | £7.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19TH SEPTEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN KENT WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
MICHAELMAS COTTAGE
STAN LANE
WEST PECKHAM
MAIDSTONE
ME18 5JT
- Phone:
- 01622817693
- Email:
- woolystevenson@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window