ENHAM TRUST

Charity number: 211235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A UK Charity, a Company limited by guarantee and a Registered Provider, specialising in providing access to employment and independence, equality of opportunity, and improved quality of life for disabled people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 1963: Standard registration
  • 17 August 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ENABLING PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
  • ENHAM (Previous name)
  • ENHAM VILLAGE CENTRE (Previous name)
  • THE ENHAM TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Homes England
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen John Trusler Chair 03 November 2023
None on record
Mehul Desai Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Amanda Susan Williams Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Bjorn Axel Howard Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Clive John Barnett Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Christopher Benn Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Caroline Sheila Wehrle Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Tracey Mary Ann Peters Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Michael Barry McCullen Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Claire Lois Whitaker Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.29m £10.28m £10.49m £8.34m £15.43m
Total expenditure £11.13m £8.95m £9.89m £12.80m £14.19m
Income from government contracts £2.12m £2.44m £2.67m £4.71m £5.14m
Income from government grants N/A £540.15k £37.62k £10.19k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £291.00k £790.00k £941.00k £361.25k £6.90m
Income - Other trading activities £194.00k £90.00k £149.00k £134.11k £148.76k
Income - Charitable activities £9.78m £7.86m £8.29m £7.34m £8.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.00k £12.00k £12.00k £18.79k £10.71k
Income - Other £0 £1.53m £1.11m £486.96k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £326.00k £53.19k £236.57k £10.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.75m £8.50m £9.73m £12.53m £13.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £160.00k £377.00k £157.26k £261.77k £319.93k
Expenditure - Governance £74.00k £87.00k £119.00k £104.00k £112.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £222.00k £71.00k £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £11.18m £10.43m £11.23m £12.03m £11.99m
Long-term investments £379.00k £378.00k £378.00k £320.73k £320.73k
Other assets £1.67m £3.21m £2.53m £1.53m £2.20m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.15m -£2.07m -£1.69m -£1.62m -£1.59m
Total liabilities £6.76m £6.57m £6.40m £10.59m £10.00m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH MAY 1920 AND SCHEME OF THE 13TH SEPTEMBER 1946
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND EXPENSES OF THE CENTRE AT ENHAM IN HAMPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 16 April 1963 : Standard registration
  • 17 August 1993 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Enham Trust
Enham Alamein
ANDOVER
SP11 6JS
Phone:
01380 735 327