Financial history THE SPROUGHTON ALMSHOUSE AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 211278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.08k £4.89k £5.35k £6.21k £7.60k
Total expenditure £2.68k £3.95k £908 £960 £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A