THE SPROUGHTON ALMSHOUSE AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting and maintenance of two alms houses in Sproughton village. Provision of grants to relieve hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Natalie West | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
SIMON FRASER CURL | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
TESSA ROSINA EAREY | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH JOHN SHEPPARD | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Seager | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08k | £4.89k | £5.35k | £6.21k | £7.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £3.95k | £908 | £960 | £1.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19TH JULY 1983
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES TO BE OCCUPIED BY POOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF SPROUGHTON.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SPROUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WAYSIDE COTTAGE
BRAMFORD ROAD
SPROUGHTON
IPSWICH
IP8 3BW
- Phone:
- 01473741410
- Email:
- kenseager511@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window