CPRE HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 211299
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NOTE. Dissolution occurred on 4 September 2018 and notification was sent to the Charity Commission. See CPRE Herts CIO 1162419. Promotion of the beauty, tranquility and diversity of rural Hertfordshire by encouragement of sustainable use of land and other natural resources in town and country and the offering of advice and support to individuals and to local groups embarking on planning campaigns.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 12 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • C P R E HERTFORDSHIRE (Working name)
  • CPRE HERTFORDSHIRE (Working name)
  • "THE HERTFORDSHIRE SOCIETY" (HERTFORDSHIRE BRANCH OF THE COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND) (Previous name)
  • CPRE - THE HERTFORDSHIRE SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • CPRE - THE HERTSFORDSHIRE SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • HERTFORDSHIRE CONSERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/03/2016 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £44.92k £51.62k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £45.76k £54.10k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 February 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 February 2017 28 days late

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06 FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF LANDS AND BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR OUTSTANDING BEAUTY HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST OR CHARACTER WITHIN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID COUNTY.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 12 September 2019 : Removed