Trustees THE MAHARAJAH'S WELL

Charity number: 211310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara O'Byrne Chair 01 February 2012
None on record
Roger Clayson Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Sylvia Miller Trustee 01 June 2018
STOKE ROW VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
DR GRAEME WHITEHALL Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Rob Dougherty Trustee 01 November 2012
None on record
Karen Dougherty Trustee 01 November 2012
None on record
Tracey Preedy Trustee 01 June 2011
None on record