HOUSING FOR WOMEN

Charity Number: 211351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A registered housing association providing affordable accommodation and services to women in London and their dependants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 1995: Standard registration
  • 28 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE OVER FORTY ASSOCIATION FOR WOMEN WORKERS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Kane Chair 24 March 2020
None on record
Victoria Dingle Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Helena Evans Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Somayya Yaqub Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Elaine Marshall Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record
Yvonne Kikelola Akinmodun Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Simon Basey Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Carli Harper Trustee 13 August 2021
NORWICH HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Troy Henshall Trustee 13 August 2021
None on record
Caroline Davies Trustee 18 May 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £8.00m £7.98m £7.89m £8.39m £9.04m
Total expenditure £7.78m £8.08m £7.86m £8.82m £10.46m
Income from government contracts £560.04k £476.68k N/A N/A £625.16k
Income from government grants N/A £162.39k £472.85k £832.09k £685.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.32k £52.11k £79.43k £50.56k £179.94k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.95m £7.93m £7.77m £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £28.36k £0
Income - Investment £0 £27.72k £36.07k £0 £0
Income - Other £36.33k £0 £0 £8.34m £8.86m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.78m £8.08m £7.86m £8.82m £10.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £25.00k £16.67k £19.13k £20.00k £32.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £68.65m £69.25m £70.21m £71.94m £72.23m
Long-term investments £14.40k £14.40k £5.46k £4.58k £5.13k
Other assets £3.61m £7.95m £4.62m £11.92m £5.40m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £57.11m £62.15m £60.89m £71.66m £69.49m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 August 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 August 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 5TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF WOMEN OVER THE AGE OF 50 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS EITHER IN THE FORM OF GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANT OF MONEY WHICH MAY INCLUDE GRANTS TO ANY ALMSHOUSE OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID PROVIDED THAT THE INCOME SHALL NOT BE APPLIED DIRECTLY IN THE RELIEF OF THE PUBLIC FUNDS BUT MAY BE APPLIED IN SUPPLEMENTING RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE PROVIDED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 29 September 1995 : Standard registration
  • 28 September 2019 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
HOUSING FOR WOMEN
BLUE STAR HOUSE
234-240 STOCKWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW9 9SP
Phone:
02075016120