THE STABLES TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation of the 'Stables' building and its operation as a theatre and arts centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Sellman | Chair | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Saint Vire | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Randall | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HUGO TREBELS | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Baillie | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARDING | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Jane Warrington | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Leslie Dormer | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.34k | £124.59k | £136.71k | £183.87k | £208.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.43k | £122.12k | £110.50k | £168.47k | £181.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £74.88k | £9.79k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1957. as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION OF BUILDINGS OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND IN PARTICULAR OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS "THE STABLES" IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF HASTINGS.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS AND NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stables Theatre
The Bourne
HASTINGS
TN34 3BD
- Phone:
- 01424423221
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window